US HB3519 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 257.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 257.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection Accountability Act and Transparency Act of 2013 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 to: (1) rename the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) the Financial Product Safety Commission (FPSC) , (2) remove it from the Federal Reserve System, and (3) repeal the authority of the FPSC Director to establish regional offices in cities in which either Federal Reserve Banks or their branches are located. Repeals the requirement that not fewer than six members of the Consumer Advisory Board be appointed to it by the FPSC Director on a rotating basis upon the recommendation of the regional Federal Reserve Bank Presidents. (Sec. 3) Repeals the mandatory annual transfer of funds to the CFPB from the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. Subjects the FPSC to the regular authorization, budget, and appropriations process of the Department of the Treasury. Eliminates the Consumer Financial Protection Fund. Authorizes appropriations for each of FY2014 and FY2015. (Sec. 4) Deems any reference in any record of the United States to the CFPB to be a reference to the FPSC.
Title
Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection Accountability and Transparency Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 257. |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 113-347. |
2013-11-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 24. |
2013-11-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-11-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2013-10-29 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3192 (Related) 2013-10-29 - Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
Subjects
Appropriations
Consumer affairs
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Consumer affairs
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments