US HB3487 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on December 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-72.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on December 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-72.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.) Amends the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to extend through December 31, 2018, the authority of the Federal Election Commission (FEC) to impose civil money penalties on the basis of a schedule of penalties it has established and published. Applies such penalties to violations of qualified campaign contribution and expenditure disclosure requirements.
Title
To amend the Federal Election Campaign Act to extend through 2018 the authority of the Federal Election Commission to impose civil money penalties on the basis of a schedule of penalties established and published by the Commission, to expand such authority to certain other violations, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Phil Gingrey [R-GA] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Richard Nugent [R-FL] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] |
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-26 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-72. |
2013-12-26 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-12-23 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9111) |
2013-11-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2013-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7163-7164) |
2013-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3487. |
2013-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7163-7164) |
2013-11-18 | House | Mrs. Miller (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-11-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal Election Commission (FEC)
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal Election Commission (FEC)
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics