US HB3476 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Middle Class College Tuition Tax Credit Expansion Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to replace the Hope Scholarship and Lifetime Learning tax credits with a new American Opportunity Tax Credit that: (1) allows an increased income tax credit for the qualified tuition and related expenses of a student who is carrying at least one half of a normal course load, (2) increases the income threshold for reductions in the credit amount based upon modified adjusted gross income, (3) allows a lifetime dollar limitation on such credit of $25,000 for all taxable years, and (4) makes 50% of the credit refundable. Allows an exclusion from gross income of any amount received as a Federal Pell Grant.
Title
Middle Class College Tuition Tax Credit Expansion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1738 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2275 (Related) 2013-06-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3393 (Related) 2014-07-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 493.
HB3437 (Related) 2013-10-30 - Referred to House Education and the Workforce
SB835 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1090 (Related) 2013-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2275 (Related) 2013-06-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3393 (Related) 2014-07-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 493.
HB3437 (Related) 2013-10-30 - Referred to House Education and the Workforce
SB835 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1090 (Related) 2013-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Educational technology and distance education
Higher education
Income tax credits
Income tax exclusion
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
Higher education
Income tax credits
Income tax exclusion
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3476/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3476/BILLS-113hr3476ih.pdf |