US HB3437 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-30 - Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-30 - Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
College Affordability Act of 2013 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to replace the Hope Scholarship and Lifetime Learning tax credits with a new American Opportunity Tax Credit that allows: (1) a 100% income tax credit, up to $2,500 in a taxable year, of the qualified tuition and related expenses (i.e., tuition, fees, and course materials) of a student at an institution of higher education who is carrying at least one half of a normal full-time work load; (2) a life-time aggregate credit amount of up to $10,000; and (3) refundability of a portion of such credit. Denies such credit to students who are convicted of a federal or state felony offense involving the possession or distribution of a controlled substance. Allows an exclusion from gross income of any amount received as a Federal Pell Grant. Establishes programs for: (1) periodic payments to students as qualified expenses are incurred during the taxable year, and (2) informing the public of the availability of the American Opportunity Tax Credit.
Title
College Affordability Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-30 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1738 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2253 (Related) 2013-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3393 (Related) 2014-07-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 493.
SB835 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1090 (Related) 2013-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3476 (Related) 2013-11-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2253 (Related) 2013-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3393 (Related) 2014-07-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 493.
SB835 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1090 (Related) 2013-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3476 (Related) 2013-11-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government information and archives
Higher education
Income tax credits
Income tax exclusion
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
Government information and archives
Higher education
Income tax credits
Income tax exclusion
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3437/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3437/BILLS-113hr3437ih.pdf |