US HB3411 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on October 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-09 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-09 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sabine National Forest Land Exchange Act of 2013 - Requires a land exchange between the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) and the Sabine River Authority of Texas involving the Sabine National Forest, the Indian Mounds Wilderness Area, and the Toledo Bend Project in Texas. Requires the costs of the land exchange to be shared equally by the Authority and the Secretary, and the land exchange to be conducted on an equal value basis.
Title
Sabine National Forest Land Exchange Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] | Rep. Ralph Hall [R-TX] |
Rep. Steve Stockman [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-09 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-12-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry. |
2013-11-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1484 (Related) 2013-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
Electric power generation and transmission
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
Texas
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
Texas
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3411/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3411/BILLS-113hr3411ih.pdf |