US HB3390 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on October 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lake Tahoe Restoration Act of 2013 - Amends the Lake Tahoe Restoration Act to require the Secretary of Agriculture, acting through the Chief of the U.S. Forest Service, to: (1) conduct forest management activities in the Lake Tahoe Basin in a manner that helps achieve and maintain the environmental threshold carrying capacities established by the Tahoe Regional Planning Agency (Agency) and attains multiple ecosystem benefits, unless the attainment of such benefits would excessively increase the project's cost in relation to the additional benefits gained; (2) establish post-project ground condition criteria for ground disturbance caused by forest management activities; and (3) provide for monitoring to ascertain the attainment of such conditions. Requires the Lake Tahoe Basin Management Unit to: (1) manage vehicular parking and traffic in the Unit, and (2) support the attainment of the environmental threshold carrying capacities. Withdraws federal land located in the Unit from: (1) all forms of entry, appropriation, or disposal under the public land laws; (2) location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and (3) disposition under all laws relating to mineral and geothermal leasing. Exempts a land conveyance from withdrawal if carried out under the Lake Tahoe Restoration Act or the Santini-Burton Act. Requires the Chair of the Lake Tahoe Federal Interagency Partnership to submit to Congress a prioritized list of all Environmental Improvement Program projects for the Basin. Authorizes the Secretary, the Director of the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, the Director of the U.S. Geological Survey (USGS), and the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to carry out or provide financial assistance to specified projects and projects included in the prioritized list that have been subject to environmental review and approval under federal and state law and the Tahoe Regional Planning Compact. Requires the Director of the United States Fish and Wildlife Service to deploy strategies consistent with the Lake Tahoe Aquatic Invasive Species Management Plan to prevent the introduction of aquatic invasive species into the Lake Tahoe Basin. Requires the Secretary, the Administrator, the Agency, California, Nevada, and the Tahoe Science Consortium to implement a Lake Tahoe Basin Program that includes: (1) developing and updating an integrated multiagency programmatic assessment and monitoring plan and evaluating the effectiveness of the Agency's Environmental Improvement Program, and (2) providing support to governments in reducing pollutants that contribute to the loss of lake clarity. Prohibits: (1) the importation of the quagga mussel of the species Dreissena rostriformis into the United States, a U.S. territory, the District of Columbia, Puerto Rico, or any U.S. possession; and (2) the shipment of the mussel between the continental United States, the District of Columbia, Hawaii, Puerto Rico, or a U.S. possession. Requires the prohibited mussels to be exported or destroyed at the expense of the importer or consignee. Provides that nothing in this Act applies to: (1) the importation or transportation of prohibited species through the operation of a public water system or a related water conveyance, storage, or distribution facility; or (2) the possession or conveyance of water supplies containing prohibited species by a public water system operator.
Title
Lake Tahoe Restoration Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Joseph Heck [R-NV] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2013-12-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry. |
2013-11-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-11-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-10-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1451 (Related) 2014-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 422.
Subjects
Air quality
Aquatic ecology
California
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Fishes
Forests, forestry, trees
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Nevada
Outdoor recreation
Public transit
Regional and metropolitan planning
Roads and highways
Trade restrictions
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Watersheds
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Aquatic ecology
California
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Fishes
Forests, forestry, trees
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Nevada
Outdoor recreation
Public transit
Regional and metropolitan planning
Roads and highways
Trade restrictions
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Watersheds
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3390/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3390/BILLS-113hr3390ih.pdf |