US HB3375 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 113-215.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 113-215.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to be constructed at 3141 Centennial Boulevard, Colorado Springs, Colorado, as the "PFC Floyd K. Lindstrom Department of Veterans Affairs Clinic."
Title
To designate the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs to be constructed at 3141 Centennial Boulevard, Colorado Springs, Colorado, as the "PFC Floyd K. Lindstrom Department of Veterans Affairs Clinic".
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 396 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-215. |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6305) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2014-06-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 396 - 0 (Roll no. 313). (text: CR H5381) |
2014-06-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5389-5390) |
2014-06-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-06-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3375. |
2014-06-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5381-5383) |
2014-06-17 | House | Mr. Lamborn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-11-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-10-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1606 (Same As) 2013-10-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Colorado
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care
Colorado
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care