US HB3334 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Adult Day Services Act of 2013 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to: (1) cover certified adult day services furnished in a certified adult day services center and meeting specified requirements; and (2) require the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to increase by 3% the payment amount otherwise effective for such services furnished in a rural area on or after January 1, 2014, and before January 1, 2016.
Title
Medicare Adult Day Services Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] |
Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] |
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] |
Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Gloria Negrete McLeod [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-10-23 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-10-23 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-10-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3334/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3334/BILLS-113hr3334ih.pdf |