US HB3308 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 113-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Taxpayer Transparency Act of 2014 - Requires each communication funded by a federal agency that is an advertisement, or that provides information about any federal program, benefit, or service to clearly state: (1) in the case of a printed communication, including mass mailings, signs, and billboards, that the communication is printed or published at taxpayer expense; and (2) in the case of a communication transmitted through radio, television, or the Internet, that the communication is produced or disseminated at taxpayer expense. Requires such notification to state that a communication is provided by the U.S. government, rather than at taxpayer expense, if the communication is funded entirely by user fees or by other sources that do not include federal funds. Requires any such printed communication: (1) to be of sufficient size to be clearly readable; and (2) to the extent feasible, to be contained in a printed box set apart from the other contents of the communication and to be printed with a reasonable degree of color contrast between the background and the printed statement. Sets forth similar requirements for audio, video, and email communications. Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to develop and issue guidance on implementing the requirements of this Act. Prohibits judicial review of the compliance or noncompliance with any provision of this Act.
Title
Taxpayer Transparency Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-02-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1947-1948) |
2014-02-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3308. |
2014-02-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1947-1950) |
2014-02-26 | House | Mr. Farenthold moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. (consideration: CR H1947) |
2014-02-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 266. |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-358. |
2014-02-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-02-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1921 (Related) 2014-01-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Marketing and advertising
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Government operations and politics
Marketing and advertising
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers