US HB3289 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS), during any period for which interim or full-year appropriations for FY2014 are not in effect for payment of military death gratuities and funeral and related transportation and housing expenses, to transfer, from unobligated amounts in the Health Insurance Reform Implementation Fund established by the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010 (P.L. 111-152), to the Secretary of Defense (DOD) sufficient funds to provide the following benefits on behalf of members of the Armed Forces who die during such period: payment of death gratuities to certain survivors of deceased military service members, including for the death of members on active duty or inactive duty training, the death of members after discharge or release from duty or training, members and employees dying outside the United States while assigned to intelligence duties, and other eligible survivors; payment of authorized funeral and burial expenses, including authorized funeral travel and travel related to the dignified transfer of remains and unit memorial services; and temporary continuation of a basic allowance of housing for certain dependents of members dying on active duty.
Title
To provide funds during the lapse of appropriations for the payment of military death gratuities and funeral and related transportation and housing expenses through the transfer of unobligated amounts in the Health Insurance Reform Implementation Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Kingston [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-10-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR91 (Related) 2013-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 113-44.
HB3274 (Related) 2013-10-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB3274 (Related) 2013-10-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Comprehensive health care
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
Transportation costs
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Comprehensive health care
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
Transportation costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3289/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3289/BILLS-113hr3289ih.pdf |