US HB3246 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Support Our Department of Defense Civilian Employees Act - Expresses the sense of Congress that all civilian employees and contractors of the Department of Defense (DOD) and the Coast Guard serve to provide support to members of the Armed Forces. Amends the Pay Our Military Act (P.L. 113-39) to make FY2014 continuing appropriations for any period during which interim or full-year appropriations for FY2014 are not in effect to provide for: (1) pay and allowances to all civilian personnel of DOD (and the Department of Homeland Security [DHS] in the case of the Coast Guard) (under such Act only personnel whom the Secretary concerned determines are providing support to members of the Armed Forces performing active service); and (2) compensation to all employees of contractors of DOD, and DHS in the case of the Coast Guard (under such Act only contractors whom the Secretary concerned determines are providing support to members of the Armed Forces performing active service). Requires the Secretary of Defense (and the Secretary of Homeland Security with respect to the Coast Guard) to ensure that all civilian personnel of DOD and the Coast Guard who were not in "retained" or "excepted" status at any time during the period beginning on October 1, 2013, are treated as retained or excepted during the period for which such continuing appropriations are made available, effective as of the enactment of this Act.
Title
Support Our Department of Defense Civilian Employees Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2013-10-04 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2013-10-04 | House | Referred to House Appropriations |
2013-10-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3210 (Related) 2013-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 113-39.
HB3232 (Related) 2013-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB3241 (Related) 2013-10-04 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6242)
HB3232 (Related) 2013-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB3241 (Related) 2013-10-04 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6242)
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Coast guard
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Armed forces and national security
Coast guard
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3246/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3246/BILLS-113hr3246ih.pdf |