US HB3183 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-21 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 25.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-21 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 25.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 to direct the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) to: (1) disclose to a consumer all information (and their sources) held by the CFPB with respect to that consumer, including any person or other federal department or agency to which the CFPB disclosed the information; and (2) truncate in the disclosure the first five digits of the consumer's Social Security number (or similar identification number), if the consumer so requests and the CFPB has received appropriate proof of the requester's identity. Permits consumers to request such a disclosure: (1) online, with a link prominently displayed on the CFPB website; (2) via U.S. mail; and (3) via a toll-free telephone number.
Title
To amend the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 to provide consumers with a free annual disclosure of information the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection maintains on them, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] | Rep. Michele Bachmann [R-MN] | Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Rep. John Campbell [R-CA] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Stephen Fincher [R-TN] |
Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] |
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] |
Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 25. |
2013-11-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-10-29 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral. |
2013-09-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1667 (Same As) 2013-11-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government information and archives
Consumer credit
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government information and archives
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3183/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3183/BILLS-113hr3183ih.pdf |