US HB3180 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes among the circumstances under which the federal government shall not be entitled to recover a portion of the value of state home facilities that received a grant for, but that the state has ceased to operate for, furnishing domiciliary or nursing home care to veterans the provision by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) of a contract or grant for veterans' residential care in such facilities.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to include contracts and grants for residential care for veterans in the exception to the requirement that the Federal Government recover a portion of the value of certain projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-10-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-09-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1540 (Same As) 2013-10-30 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-280.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Public contracts and procurement
Veterans' medical care
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Public contracts and procurement
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3180/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3180/BILLS-113hr3180ih.pdf |