US HB3174 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) to obligate any funds made available to implement federal-aid highway emergency relief for projects arising from damage caused by severe weather events in 2013, without any limitation on obligations for such projects resulting from a single natural disaster or catastrophic failure in a state.
Title
To authorize the Secretary of Transportation to obligate funds for emergency relief projects arising from damage caused by severe weather events in 2013, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2013-11-18 | Senate | For Further Action See H.R.2775. |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Provisions of HR 3174 were incorporated in HR 2775. See HR 2775 for further action. |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2013-09-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6016) |
2013-09-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3174. |
2013-09-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6016-6019) |
2013-09-30 | House | Mr. Petri moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-09-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2013-09-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1560 (Related) 2013-09-30 - Held at the desk.
HB2775 (Related) 2013-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 113-46.
HB2775 (Related) 2013-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 113-46.
Subjects
Appropriations
Disaster relief and insurance
Floods and storm protection
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Disaster relief and insurance
Floods and storm protection
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding