US HB3159 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring Adversarial Process in the FISA Court Act - Amends the Intelligence Reform and Terrorism Prevention Act of 2004 to require the Privacy and Civil Liberties Oversight Board (an independent agency that reviews executive branch actions taken to protect the nation from terrorism in order to ensure a balance with privacy and civil liberties) to appoint: (1) attorneys to serve as public interest advocates in proceedings before the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court (FISC), a judge of the petition review pool, the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court of Review (FISCR), and the Supreme Court under the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 (FISA); and (2) technical and subject-matter experts (including experts of computer networks, telecommunications, encryption, and cybersecurity), not employed by the federal government, to be available to assist such advocates in performing their duties. Requires such courts, in any matter involving a significant interpretation or construction of FISA, to appoint at least one public interest advocate who will: (1) participate fully with the same rights and privileges as the federal government; (2) represent the interests of the people of the United States in preserving privacy and civil liberties, including with respect to rights under the Fourth Amendment to the Constitution; and (3) have access to all relevant evidence as well as the authority to petition the court to order the government to produce other necessary evidence. Authorizes such advocates to file motions and briefs, respond to motions or filings made by the federal government, and request rehearings or en banc consideration of a decision. Permits the FISC to request review by the FISCR, and permits the FISCR to request review by the Supreme Court, when matters before such courts in which a public interest advocate has been appointed involve a question of law in which there is substantial ground for difference of opinion. Requires the United States and the public interest advocate, when a court has requested such a review, to be given an opportunity to provide written briefs or arguments related to a decision by the FISCR or the Supreme Court to review a ruling. Allows each relevant court, upon a finding that it would benefit from additional views, to permit participation by amicus curiae.
Title
Ensuring Adversarial Process in the FISA Court Act
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. John Carney [D-DE] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2013-09-20 | House | Referred to House Intelligence (Permanent Select) |
2013-09-20 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-09-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3228 (Related) 2013-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB1551 (Related) 2013-09-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1551 (Related) 2013-09-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Evidence and witnesses
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Judges
Lawyers and legal services
Privacy and Civil Liberties Oversight Board
Right of privacy
Specialized courts
Supreme Court
Terrorism
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Evidence and witnesses
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Judges
Lawyers and legal services
Privacy and Civil Liberties Oversight Board
Right of privacy
Specialized courts
Supreme Court
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3159/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3159/BILLS-113hr3159ih.pdf |