US HB3111 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 202-24)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honoring the Fort Hood Heroes Act - Directs: (1) the Secretary of the military department concerned to award the Purple Heart to members of the Armed Forces (members) who were killed or wounded in the attack at Fort Hood, Texas, on November 5, 2009; and (2) the Secretary of Defense (DOD) to award the Secretary of Defense Medal for the Defense of Freedom to civilian employees and contractors of DOD who were killed or wounded in such attack. Deems, for purposes of all applicable federal benefit laws, regulations, and policies: (1) such members to have been killed or wounded in a combat zone as the result of an enemy act; and (2) such employees to have been killed or wounded by hostile action while serving with the Armed Forces in a contingency operation and to have been killed or wounded in a terrorist attack. Excludes any member whose death or wound was the result of willful misconduct. Applies such provisions to post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD) or other psychological injuries that were a a result of such attack.
Title
Honoring the Fort Hood Heroes Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2013-09-18 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5629) |
2013-09-17 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2013-09-17 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2013-09-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1500 (Same As) 2013-09-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6448)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Crime victims
Department of Defense
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Mental health
Military facilities and property
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Terrorism
Texas
Violent crime
Crime victims
Department of Defense
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Mental health
Military facilities and property
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Terrorism
Texas
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3111/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3111/BILLS-113hr3111ih.pdf |