US HB3091 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modernizing Our Drug & Diagnostics Evaluation and Regulatory Network Cures Act of 2013 or MODDERN Cures Act of 2013 - Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to: (1) establish the Advanced Diagnostics Education Council to recommend standard terms and definitions related to innovative diagnostics for use by patients, physicians, health care providers, payers, and policy makers; and (2) publish a guide regarding such terms and definitions. Sets forth additional factors for the Secretary to consider in determining the payment amount for new clinical diagnostic laboratory tests under gap filling procedures which are used when no comparable existing test is available. Extends the exclusivity period for a medicine if the diagnostic test related to such drug has been determined by the Secretary to have been developed by, or with the participation of, the manufacturer or sponsor of the medicine, and use of the diagnostic tests provides for or improves: (1) the identification of a patient population for the medicine; or (2) the determination of the most appropriate treatment option for a patient population with the medicine. Establishes a dormant therapy designation for medicine that addresses unmet medical needs. Gives such medicine 15 years of data exclusivity under which no drug can be approved by relying on the approval or licensure of the dormant therapy. Directs the Secretary to arrange with the Institute of Medicine (or, if it declines, another appropriate entity) to study intellectual property laws and their impact on therapy and diagnostic development in order to formulate recommendations on how to facilitate the clinical evaluation and development of therapies currently available on the market for new potential indications.
Title
MODDERN Cures Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Jon Runyan [R-NJ] | Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] |
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2013-09-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-09-12 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-09-12 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-09-12 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3116 (Related) 2014-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB2085 (Related) 2013-06-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2085 (Related) 2013-06-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Executive agency funding and structure
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Government studies and investigations
Intellectual property
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Executive agency funding and structure
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Government studies and investigations
Intellectual property
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3091/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3091/BILLS-113hr3091ih.pdf |