US HB3035 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Surveillance Order Reporting Act of 2013 - Permits each electronic service provider to report information to the public about requests and demands for information made by any government entity under a surveillance law and exempts such provider from liability with respect to that report even if the provider would otherwise be prohibited by a surveillance law from reporting that information. Allows the provider to report such information not more often than quarterly and only to the extent that the report reveals estimates of the number of such demands and requests made, the number the service provider complied with, and the numbers of users and/or accounts for which information was demanded, requested, or provided. Permits any estimate disclosed to be: (1) an overall estimate or broken down by categories of, or provisions of, authorizing surveillance laws; and (2) expressed in no greater detail than in a range of 100, rounded to the nearest 100s. Defines "surveillance law" to include the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 and specified sections of the National Security Act of 1947, the Right to Financial Privacy Act of 1978, the Fair Credit Reporting Act, and the federal criminal code (dealing with counterintelligence access to telephone toll and transactional records).
Title
Surveillance Order Reporting Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Justin Amash [R-MI] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] |
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to House Intelligence (Permanent Select) |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1551 (Related) 2013-09-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3361 (Related) 2014-06-05 - Select Committee on Intelligence. Hearings held.
HB3361 (Related) 2014-06-05 - Select Committee on Intelligence. Hearings held.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Consumer credit
Government information and archives
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Internet and video services
Telephone and wireless communication
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Consumer credit
Government information and archives
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Internet and video services
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3035/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3035/BILLS-113hr3035ih.pdf |