US HB301 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 49-24)
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Sec. 2) Directs the President to appoint a Special Envoy to Promote Religious Freedom of Religious Minorities in the Near East and South Central Asia within the Department of State. Requires the Special Envoy to have the rank of ambassador. (Sec. 3) Requires the Special Envoy to: (1) promote the right of religious freedom of religious minorities in the countries of the Near East and South Central Asia, denounce the violation of such right, and recommend appropriate U.S government responses to such violations; (2) monitor and combat acts of religious intolerance and incitement targeted against such religious minorities; (3) ensure that the needs of such religious minority communities are addressed, including economic and security needs directly tied to religious-based discrimination and persecution; (4) work with foreign governments of such countries to address inherently discriminatory laws; and (5) coordinate and assist in the preparation of specified reports required by the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 and the International Religious Freedom Act of 1998. (Sec. 4) Authorizes the Special Envoy, subject to direction by the President and the Secretary of State, to represent the United States in matters and cases relevant to religious freedom in: (1) contacts with foreign governments, intergovernmental organizations, and specialized agencies of the United Nations (U.N.), the Organization of Security and Cooperation in Europe, and other international organizations; and (2) multilateral conferences and meetings relevant to religious freedom. (Sec. 5) Requires the Special Envoy to give priority to programs, projects, and activities for Egypt, Iran, Iraq, Afghanistan, and Pakistan. (Sec. 6) Directs the Secretary to eliminate certain positions within the State Department as necessary to offset the costs of carrying out this Act. (Sec. 7) Declares that this Act shall cease to be effective on October 1, 2018.
Title
To provide for the establishment of the Special Envoy to Promote Religious Freedom of Religious Minorities in the Near East and South Central Asia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-18 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 402 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2013-09-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 22 (Roll no. 465). (text: CR 9/17/2013 H5564-5565) |
2013-09-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5606) |
2013-09-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-09-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 301. |
2013-09-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5564-5567) |
2013-09-17 | House | Mr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa. |
2013-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific. |
2013-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations. |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2013-01-15 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E31) |
Same As/Similar To
SB653 (Related) 2014-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 113-161.
Subjects
Afghanistan
Africa
Asia
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Egypt
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Human rights
International affairs
Iran
Iraq
Middle East
Pakistan
Religion
Africa
Asia
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Egypt
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Human rights
International affairs
Iran
Iraq
Middle East
Pakistan
Religion