US HB2978 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Let the People Draw the Lines Act of 2013 - Prohibits a state that has been redistricted after an apportionment from being redistricted again until after the next apportionment of Representatives, unless the state is ordered by a court to conduct such a subsequent redistricting in order to comply with the Constitution or enforce the Voting Rights Act of 1965. Requires any congressional redistricting to be conducted according to: (1) a plan developed by the independent redistricting commission established in the state; or (2) if such plan is not enacted into law, the redistricting plan selected by the state's highest court or developed by a U.S. district court. Requires each state to establish an independent redistricting commission to develop a redistricting plan for the state in accordance with specified criteria, including requirements that districts: (1) have equal population per representative as nearly as practicable; (2) comply with the Voting Rights Act of 1965; (3) are geographically contiguous; (4) have boundaries that minimize the division of any municipality, county, neighborhood, or community of interest; and (5) are geographically compact and use visible geographic features. Prohibits consideration, in developing a redistricting plan, of the political party affiliation of the population of a district or the residence of any Member of the House of Representatives or candidate. Sets forth requirements for public notice and hearings on redistricting plans and a process for enactment of a final redistricting plan. Sets forth alternative procedures for the the development of a redistricting plan by a state's highest court or a federal district court if a plan developed by a state independent redistricting commission is not enacted into law by a specified date. Provides for: (1) Election Assistance Commission payments to states for carry out redistricting, and (2) civil enforcement to carry out this Act by the Attorney General or an individual state elector who is aggrieved by a violation of this Act.
Title
Let the People Draw the Lines Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2013-08-02 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5375) |
Same As/Similar To
HB223 (Related) 2013-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice.
HB278 (Related) 2013-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice.
HB2490 (Related) 2013-07-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB2758 (Related) 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SB2910 (Related) 2014-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB278 (Related) 2013-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice.
HB2490 (Related) 2013-07-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB2758 (Related) 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SB2910 (Related) 2014-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Congress
Congressional districts and representation
Federal district courts
Judicial procedure and administration
Legal fees and court costs
Political parties and affiliation
Public participation and lobbying
State and local courts
State and local government operations
Voting rights
Congress
Congressional districts and representation
Federal district courts
Judicial procedure and administration
Legal fees and court costs
Political parties and affiliation
Public participation and lobbying
State and local courts
State and local government operations
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2978/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2978/BILLS-113hr2978ih.pdf |