US HB2920 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on August 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Financial Literacy for Students Act - Amends the Elementary and Secondary Education of 1965 (ESEA) to authorize the Secretary of Education to award matching grants to states to: (1) integrate financial literacy education into each of their public elementary and secondary schools that are eligible for school improvement funds under title I of the ESEA, and (2) train their secondary school financial literacy or entrepreneurship teachers to teach financial literacy in core academic subjects. Prohibits states from using over 20% of their grant funds to train those teachers, develop curricula, and evaluate the impact of financial literacy or personal finance education.
Title
Financial Literacy for Students Act
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] |
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] |
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2013-08-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB829 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1094 (Related) 2013-10-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 218.
SB1094 (Related) 2013-10-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 218.
Subjects
Consumer affairs
Economic theory
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Financial literacy
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Economic theory
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Financial literacy
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2920/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2920/BILLS-113hr2920ih.pdf |