US HB2913 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' Local Access Act - Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out specified major medical facility leases in: (1) New Mexico, New Jersey, South Carolina, Georgia, Hawaii, Kansas, Louisiana, Florida, Puerto Rico, Texas, California, Connecticut, and Massachusetts in FY2013; and (2) Missouri, Tennessee, California, Illinois, Texas, Nebraska, South Carolina, Arizona, and Oklahoma in FY2014.
Title
Veterans' Local Access Act
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Jon Runyan [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-08-01 | House | Referred to House Budget |
2013-08-01 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2013-08-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3521 (Related) 2013-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
SB2422 (Related) 2014-06-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 408.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
SB2422 (Related) 2014-06-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 408.
Subjects
Arizona
Armed forces and national security
California
Caribbean area
Connecticut
Florida
Georgia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Hawaii
Health facilities and institutions
Illinois
Kansas
Louisiana
Massachusetts
Missouri
Nebraska
New Jersey
New Mexico
Oklahoma
Public contracts and procurement
Puerto Rico
South Carolina
Tennessee
Texas
U.S. territories and protectorates
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
California
Caribbean area
Connecticut
Florida
Georgia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Hawaii
Health facilities and institutions
Illinois
Kansas
Louisiana
Massachusetts
Missouri
Nebraska
New Jersey
New Mexico
Oklahoma
Public contracts and procurement
Puerto Rico
South Carolina
Tennessee
Texas
U.S. territories and protectorates
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2913/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2913/BILLS-113hr2913ih.pdf |