US HB2799 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 249.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 249.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sportsmen's Heritage And Recreational Enhancement or SHARE Act - Amends the Fish and Wildlife Coordination Act to establish the Wildlife and Hunting Heritage Conservation Council Advisory Committee to advise the Secretaries of the Interior and of Agriculture (USDA) on wildlife and habitat conservation, hunting, and recreational shooting. Requires the Advisory Committee to report annually to the Secretaries and to Congress. Exempts the Advisory Committee from the Federal Advisory Committee Act. Abolishes the Wildlife and Hunting Heritage Conservation Council.
Title
SHARE Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] |
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 249. |
2014-01-29 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-336, Part I. |
2013-10-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2013-10-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-10-30 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2013-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry. |
2013-08-02 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-07-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3197 (Related) 2013-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB3590 (Related) 2014-02-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305.
HB3590 (Related) 2014-02-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Animals
Hunting and fishing
Outdoor recreation
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Animals
Hunting and fishing
Outdoor recreation
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection