US HB2776 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-6)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Nutrition.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Nutrition Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Nutrition.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Nutrition Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Review EPA's Language on Agriculture and Thoroughly Engage with the Farm Act of 2013 or the RELATE with the Farm Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) to review publications that may give notice that the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) is preparing or plans to prepare any guidance, policy, memorandum, regulation, or statement of general applicability and future effect that may have a significant impact on a substantial number of agricultural entities. Requires the Secretary, for each publication item determined to have a possible significant impact, to: (1) solicit from the EPA Administrator information to facilitate a review of the item, (2) produce an economic impact statement, (3) identify representatives of potentially affected agricultural entities to obtain advice and recommendations about the potential impacts of the item, and (4) convene a review panel that includes the Secretary to analyze the publication item. Provides procedures for submission by the Secretary of comments to the Administrator for inclusion in the administrative record and for waiver of a panel's initiation.
Title
RELATE with the Farm Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] |
Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. William Enyart [D-IL] | Rep. Stephen Fincher [R-TN] |
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Mike McIntyre [D-NC] | Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] |
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] | Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] |
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] |
Rep. Steve Southerland [R-FL] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Nutrition. |
2013-07-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1466 (Related) 2013-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB1947 (Related) 2013-06-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2642 (Related) 2014-02-07 - Became Public Law No: 113-79.
HB1947 (Related) 2013-06-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2642 (Related) 2014-02-07 - Became Public Law No: 113-79.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agriculture and food
Department of Agriculture
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agriculture and food
Department of Agriculture
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2776/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2776/BILLS-113hr2776ih.pdf |