US HB2754 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-288.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-288.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Collectible Coin Protection Act - Amends the Hobby Protection Act to make it a violation of such Act for a person to provide substantial assistance or support to any manufacturer, importer, or seller if that person knows or should have known that such manufacturer, importer, or seller has engaged in any act or practice that violates requirements for plainly identifying imitation political items or imitation coins and other numismatic items. Provides that if such a violation also involves the unauthorized use of registered trademarks belonging to a collectibles certification service, the owner of such trademarks shall also have all rights provided under appropriate provisions of the Trademark Act of 1946.
Title
Collectible Coin Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
Rep. Lee Terry [R-NE] | Rep. Henry Waxman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-288. |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6839) |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2013-07-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-07-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5147) |
2013-07-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2754. |
2013-07-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5147-5148) |
2013-07-30 | House | Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade. |
2013-07-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1849 (Related) 2013-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.