US HB272 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-19-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-25 - Became Public Law No: 113-130.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-19-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-25 - Became Public Law No: 113-130.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) and Department of Defense (DOD) joint outpatient clinic to be constructed in Marina, California, as the "Major General William H. Gourley VA-DOD Outpatient Clinic."
Title
To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs and Department of Defense joint outpatient clinic to be constructed in Marina, California, as the "Major General William H. Gourley VA-DOD Outpatient Clinic".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-18 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 388 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-25 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-130. |
2014-07-25 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4364) |
2013-11-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2013-11-18 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2013-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 388 - 0 (Roll no. 589). (text: CR H7165-7166) |
2013-11-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7168) |
2013-11-18 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 272. |
2013-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7165-7167) |
2013-11-18 | House | Mr. Wenstrup moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2013-01-15 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H99) |
Subjects
California
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Health facilities and institutions
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Health facilities and institutions
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care