US HB2673 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 52-4)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-16 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-16 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Portfolio Lending and Mortgage Access Act - Amends the Truth in Lending Act with respect to the permission that a creditor may presume that a residential mortgage loan has met the requirement that, at the time the loan is consummated, the consumer has a reasonable ability to repay it, if the loan is a qualified mortgage. Treats as a qualified mortgage any residential mortgage loan made by a creditor so long as it appears on the creditor's balance sheet (held on portfolio).
Title
Portfolio Lending and Mortgage Access Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-16 | House | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2014-05-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 23. |
2014-05-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2641 (Related) 2014-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2673/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2673/BILLS-113hr2673ih.pdf |