US HB2672 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-16 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-16 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Helping Expand Lending Practices in Rural Communities Act - Directs the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) to establish an application process under which a person who lives or does business in a state may apply to have an area in the state identified as a rural area if it has not yet been so designated by the CFPB for purposes of federal consumer financial law. Prescribes criteria for the CFPB to consider when evaluating the application. Requires the CFPB to: (1) grant or deny the application within 90 days after the public comment period ends; and (3) publish the grant or denial in the Federal Register, including an explanation of the factors upon which the CFPB relied in making its determination. Sunsets this Act two years after its date of enactment.
Title
Helping Expand Lending Practices in Rural Communities Act
Sponsors
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-16 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2014-05-06 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2014-05-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3420) |
2014-05-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2672. |
2014-05-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3420-3422) |
2014-05-06 | House | Mrs. Capito moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-03-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 55 - 1. |
2014-03-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-12-04 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral. |
2013-07-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1916 (Related) 2014-09-16 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HB5786 (Related) 2014-12-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB5786 (Related) 2014-12-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer affairs
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Rural conditions and development
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer affairs
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Rural conditions and development