US HB2655 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Lawsuit Abuse Reduction Act of 2013 - Amends the sanctions provisions in Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to require the court to impose an appropriate sanction on any attorney, law firm, or party that has violated, or is responsible for the violation of, the rule with regard to representations to the court. Requires any sanction to compensate parties injured by the conduct in question. Removes a provision that prohibits filing a motion for sanctions if the challenged paper, claim, defense, contention, or denial is withdrawn or appropriately corrected within 21 days after service or within another time the court sets. Authorizes the court to impose additional sanctions, including striking the pleadings, dismissing the suit, nonmonetary directives, or penalty payments if warranted for effective deterrence.
Title
Lawsuit Abuse Reduction Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] |
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. George Holding [R-NC] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2013-11-14 - House - On Passage (Y: 228 N: 195 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 197 N: 225 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-11-14 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 197 N: 225 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2013-11-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-11-14 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 228 - 195 (Roll no. 581). (text: CR H7069) |
2013-11-14 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 197 - 225 (Roll no. 580). |
2013-11-14 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H7078) |
2013-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Lewis motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to prohibit provisions of the bill from applying to any cases brought under civil rights laws or the Constitution. |
2013-11-14 | House | Mr. Lewis moved to recommit with instructions to Judiciary. (consideration: CR H7077-7078; text: CR H7077) |
2013-11-14 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H7077) |
2013-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2655. |
2013-11-14 | House | The resolution provides for the consideration of H.R. 2655 and H.R. 982. In the case of H.R. 2655, the resolution provides for one hour of debate and one motion to recommit. In the case of H.R. 982, the resolution provides for one hour of general debate and makes in order only those amendments printed in the Rules Committee report. The resolution also provides for one motion to recommit the bill H.R. 982. |
2013-11-14 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 403. (consideration: CR H7069-7079) |
2013-11-12 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 403 Reported to House. The resolution provides for the consideration of H.R. 2655 and H.R. 982. In the case of H.R. 2655, the resolution provides for one hour of debate and one motion to recommit. In the case of H.R. 982, the resolution provides for one hour of general debate and makes in order only those amendments printed in the Rules Committee report. The resolution also provides for one motion to recommit the bill H.R. 982. |
2013-10-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 181. |
2013-10-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-255. |
2013-09-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 10. |
2013-09-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-17 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 6 - 2 . |
2013-07-17 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2013-07-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1288 (Same As) 2013-07-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR403 (Related) 2013-11-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5360 (Related) 2014-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
HR403 (Related) 2013-11-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5360 (Related) 2014-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Judicial procedure and administration
Law
Lawyers and legal services
Legal fees and court costs
Judicial procedure and administration
Law
Lawyers and legal services
Legal fees and court costs