US HB2600 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-167.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-167.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Interstate Land Sales Full Disclosure Act to exempt from certain registration and disclosure requirements the sale or lease of a condominium unit not already exempt from coverage under such Act.
Title
To amend the Interstate Land Sales Full Disclosure Act to clarify how the Act applies to condominiums.
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-26 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 410 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-167. |
2014-09-26 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-09-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5862) |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5862) |
2013-09-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2013-09-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 487). (text: CR 9/25/2013 H5822) |
2013-09-26 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5847-5848) |
2013-09-25 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2600. |
2013-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5821-5823) |
2013-09-25 | House | Mr. McHenry moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-06-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2013-06-28 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1004-1005) |
Same As/Similar To
SB2101 (Same As) 2014-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Cooperative and condominium housing
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Real estate business
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Real estate business