US HB2590 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-21-1)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
21st Century Health Care for Heroes Act - Amends the Wounded Warrior Act to direct the Secretaries of Defenseand Veterans Affairs, in implementing electronic health record systems that provide for the full interoperability of personal health care information between the Department of Defense (DOD) and Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), to ensure that: (1) a health data authoritative source is created within 180 days, (2) the ability of patients of both Departments to download their medical records is achieved within 365 days, (3) seamless integration of personal health care information between the Departments is achieved within 365 days, (4) standardization of health care data of the Departments is achieved within 365 days, (5) acceleration of the exchange of real-time data between the Departments is achieved within 365 days, (6) the upgrade of the graphical user interface to display the new standardized health care data of the Departments is achieved within 365 days, (7) incoming members of the Armed Forces and their dependents may elect to receive an electronic copy of their health care records beginning not later than October 1, 2014, and (8) current members of the Armed Forces and their dependents may elect to receive an electronic copy of their health care records beginning not later than October 1, 2015. Requires such Secretaries to study the feasibility of establishing a secure, remote, and network-accessible computer storage system (commonly referred to as cloud storage) to: (1) provide members of the Armed Forces and veterans the ability to upload their health care records, and (2) allow DOD and VA medical providers to access such records.
Title
21st Century Health Care for Heroes Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2013-07-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-06-28 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2013-06-28 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2013-06-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1296 (Related) 2013-10-30 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-280.
HB4234 (Related) 2014-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2182 (Related) 2014-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB5048 (Related) 2014-07-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4234 (Related) 2014-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2182 (Related) 2014-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB5048 (Related) 2014-07-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Health information and medical records
Military medicine
Veterans' medical care
Health information and medical records
Military medicine
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2590/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2590/BILLS-113hr2590ih.pdf |