US HB2574 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Keep Student Loans Affordable Act of 2013 - Amends title IV (Student Assistance) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 to extend the 3.4% interest rate on Direct Stafford loans first disbursed to undergraduate students between July 1, 2011, and July 1, 2013, to Direct Stafford loans first disbursed to undergraduate students between July 1, 2011, and July 1, 2014. Amends the Internal Revenue Code to modify rules for required distributions from tax-exempt pension plans to an employee who dies before such employee's entire interest is distributed to require such interest to be distributed within five years after the death of such employee, subject to exceptions for an eligible designated beneficiary and surviving spouse of such employee. Defines "eligible designated beneficiary" to include a disabled or chronically-ill individual. Exempts from such modification a binding annuity contract in effect on the enactment date of this Act.
Title
Keep Student Loans Affordable Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. George Miller [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Andrews [D-NJ] | Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] |
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. John Tierney [D-MA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Henry Waxman [D-CA] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2013-09-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources. |
2013-06-28 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2013-06-28 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-06-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1238 (Same As) 2013-07-17 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5717-5718)
Subjects
Education
Employee benefits and pensions
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Student aid and college costs
Employee benefits and pensions
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2574/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2574/BILLS-113hr2574ih.pdf |