US HB2547 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Determination of Appropriate Risk-Based Capital Requirements for Community Financial Institutions Act of 2013 - Directs the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC), and the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency (federal banking agencies) to conduct an empirical impact study before issuing a final rule in relation to proposed regulatory capital rules for the international Basel III agreement (Rules). Requires the study to include: (1) the potential impact of such Rules upon the U.S. financial services sector, specifically community, mid-size, and regional financial institutions; (2) the long-term impact of such Rules, including changes to the current risk weight framework; (3) the cost and complexity of the Rules for community financial institutions; (4) the potential indicators of community banks having to maintain higher leverage capital ratios and higher total risk-based capital ratios than non-community banks and whether such capital levels are commensurate with higher historical losses or greater risk; and (5) the impact of the Rules upon real estate markets, specifically residential mortgage lending and home equity lines of credit. Exempts this delay in rulemaking any rules applicable to global systemically important banks (as identified by the Financial Stability Board). Allows any financial institution to provide information for the study voluntarily upon agency request, but prohibits the agencies from requiring it. Requires the study to be made available to the public for notice and comment. Prohibits any regulation issued by the federal banking agencies to implement the Rules from taking effect until one year after enactment of this Act.
Title
Determination of Appropriate Risk-Based Capital Requirements for Community Financial Institutions Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Gary Miller [R-CA] |
Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] |
Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2295 (Related) 2013-06-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB731 (Related) 2013-04-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB2767 (Related) 2013-07-24 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 27.
SB731 (Related) 2013-04-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB2767 (Related) 2013-07-24 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 27.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC)
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government studies and investigations
Housing finance and home ownership
International law and treaties
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC)
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government studies and investigations
Housing finance and home ownership
International law and treaties
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2547/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2547/BILLS-113hr2547ih.pdf |