US HB2375 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-10)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transparency and Accountability in Medicare Bidding Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to delay from July 1, 2013, to a date no earlier than December 31, 2013, the implementation of: (1) round 2 of the durable medical equipment, prosthetics, orthotics, and supplies (DMEPOS) competitive bidding program under title XVIII (Medicare) the Social Security Act; and (2) the Medicare single payment amounts under the national mail order competition for diabetic supplies. Directs the Secretary to delay the start of round 1 recompete of such DMEPOS competitive bidding program from January 1, 2014, to a date no earlier than six months after the initial implementation of round 2. Requires the Secretary, acting through the Office of the Assistant Secretary for Planning and Evaluation, to contract three auction experts, a health economist, and an econometrician to work collectively as an auction expert team, led by the auction experts, to independently review and assess all aspects of round 1 re-bid and round 2 of the DMEPOS competitive bidding program, including its design, development, implementation, adequacy of support for Medicare beneficiaries with chronic illness or disabilities, market fairness, sustainability, and functioning.
Title
Transparency and Accountability in Medicare Bidding Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Bruce Braley [D-IA] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] | Rep. Daniel Maffei [D-NY] |
Rep. Mike McIntyre [D-NC] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Nick Rahall [D-WV] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Lee Terry [R-NE] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
Rep. C.W. Young [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-06-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-06-14 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-06-14 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-06-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care quality
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare
Public contracts and procurement
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care quality
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2375/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2375/BILLS-113hr2375ih.pdf |