US HB2319 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-70.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-70.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Native American Veterans' Memorial Amendments Act of 2013 - Amends the Native American Veterans' Memorial Establishment Act of 1994 to authorize the construction of the National Native American Veterans' Memorial on the property under the jurisdiction of the National Museum of the American Indian on the National Mall. (Currently, its location is restricted to the interior structure of the Museum.) Authorizes the Museum to participate in the selection of the Memorial's design, on more than a consultative basis, with the National Congress of American Indians. Makes the Museum and the National Congress of American Indians responsible for accepting contributions for, and paying the expenses of, establishing the Memorial. (Currently, the National Congress of American Indians is solely responsible for those duties.)
Title
Native American Veterans' Memorial Amendments Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
Roll Calls
2013-12-11 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 398 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-26 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-70. |
2013-12-26 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-12-23 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9068) |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2013-12-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 0 (Roll no. 633). (text: CR H7639) |
2013-12-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7666-7667) |
2013-12-11 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-12-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2319. |
2013-12-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7639-7640) |
2013-12-11 | House | Mr. Mullin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-12-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 207. |
2013-12-11 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-287. |
2013-12-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-12-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-12-04 | House | Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2013-12-04 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-07-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-06-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2013-06-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-06-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1046 (Same As) 2013-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3851)
Subjects
District of Columbia
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Native Americans
Smithsonian Institution
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Native Americans
Smithsonian Institution