US HB2253 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Higher Education and Skills Obtainment Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to replace the Hope Scholarship and Lifetime Learning tax credits with a tax credit for full and part-time post-secondary students equal to 100% of qualified tuition and related expenses up to $2,000, plus 25% of such expenses as exceeds $2,000 but not more than $4,000. Reduces the allowable amount of such credit to the extent that household income exceeds 400% of the federal poverty line. Repeals the tax deduction for qualified tuition and related expenses. Expresses the sense of Congress that any revenue saved by the enactment of this Act shall be applied to the currently projected Pell Grant funding shortfall in 2015 and to deficit reduction
Title
Higher Education and Skills Obtainment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1090 (Related) 2013-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3393 (Related) 2014-07-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 493.
HB1738 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3437 (Related) 2013-10-30 - Referred to House Education and the Workforce
SB835 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3393 (Related) 2014-07-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 493.
HB1738 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3437 (Related) 2013-10-30 - Referred to House Education and the Workforce
SB835 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Employment and training programs
Higher education
Income tax credits
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
Employment and training programs
Higher education
Income tax credits
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2253/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2253/BILLS-113hr2253ih.pdf |