US HB2223 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on December 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 113-211.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on December 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 113-211.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 220 Elm Avenue in Munising, Michigan, as the "Elizabeth L. Kinnunen Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 220 Elm Avenue in Munising, Michigan, as the "Elizabeth L. Kinnunen Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Rep. Justin Amash [R-MI] | Rep. Kerry Bentivolio [R-MI] | Rep. Dave Camp [R-MI] |
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. John Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Rep. Mike J. Rogers [R-MI] |
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-211. |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6395-6396) |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-07-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6154) |
2014-07-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2223. |
2014-07-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6154-6155) |
2014-07-14 | House | Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-05-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-06-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Michigan
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Michigan
Postal service