US HB2138 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ending VA Claims Disability Backlog and Accountability Act - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to implement the Strategic Plan to Eliminate the Compensation Claims Backlog (Plan) to ensure that, by Memorial Day (May 25) 2015, each VA disability claim is approved or denied within 125 days after its submission, with an accuracy rate of 98%. Requires a supplemental report from the Secretary to Congress on specific measures to assess implementation of the Plan and a detailed timeline to implement each initiative contained in the Plan. Directs the Secretary to enter into agreements with the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and the Secretary of Defense (DOD) to ensure that such Commissioner and DOD Secretary transfer to the VA disability or medical records the VA Secretary will use to evaluate a disability claim by not later than 30 days after the VA Secretary requests such records. Requires the two Secretaries to submit to Congress, and implement, a plan to reduce to 30 days the time needed to provide members of the National Guard and the VA Secretary with the medical records of such members. Requires the VA Secretary to establish a three-year training program for newly-hired VA claims processors. Directs the Comptroller General to report to Congress every 90 days on the Secretary's progress in implementing the Plan.
Title
Ending VA Claims Disability Backlog and Accountability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R-CA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. John Campbell [R-CA] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] |
Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2013-06-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Performance measurement
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Performance measurement
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2138/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2138/BILLS-113hr2138ih.pdf |