US HB2023 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2812)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2812)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Climate Change Health Protection and Promotion Act - Expresses the sense of Congress with respect to the impact of climate change on health systems. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to: (1) publish and implement a national strategic action plan to assist health professionals in preparing for and responding to the impact of climate change on public health in the United States and other nations, particularly developing nations; (2) revise the plan periodically to reflect new information; (3) establish a permanent science advisory board; and (4) contract with the National Research Council and the Institute of Medicine to assess the need for health professionals to prepare for and respond to the impact of climate change on public health.
Title
Climate Change Health Protection and Promotion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] |
Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2812) |
2013-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2864 (Related) 2014-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Environmental health
Government information and archives
Health
Health personnel
Medical research
World health
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Environmental health
Government information and archives
Health
Health personnel
Medical research
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2023/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2023/BILLS-113hr2023ih.pdf |