US HB2009 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 146-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 192.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 192.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Keep the IRS Off Your Health Care Act of 2013 - Prohibits the Secretary of the Treasury, or any delegate of the Secretary, from implementing or enforcing any provisions of or amendments made by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act or the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010.
Title
Keep the IRS Off Your Health Care Act of 2013
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-02 - House - On Passage (Y: 232 N: 185 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-02 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 186 N: 230 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-08-02 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 186 N: 230 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-18 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 192. |
2013-09-17 | Senate | Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2013-08-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-08-02 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 232 - 185 (Roll no. 447). (text: CR H5362) |
2013-08-02 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 186 - 230 (Roll no. 446). |
2013-08-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Nolan motion to recommit with instructions, pending the reservation of a point of order. Subsequently, the reservation was withdrawn. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House forthwith with an amendment to prohibit the bill from altering, impacting, delaying or weakening section 1401 of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act which provides tax credits to middle class families to purchase health insurance or section 1421 of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act which provides tax credits to small businesses for the purchase of health insurance coverage for employees. |
2013-08-02 | House | Mr. Nolan moved to recommit with instructions to Ways and Means. (consideration: CR H5371-5373; text: CR H5371) |
2013-08-02 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H5371) |
2013-08-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2009. |
2013-08-02 | House | In each case the rule provides for one hour of debate on the bill and one motion to recommit for each bill. |
2013-08-02 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 322. (consideration: CR H5362-5374) |
2013-07-31 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 322 Reported to House. In each case the rule provides for one hour of debate on the bill and one motion to recommit for each bill. |
2013-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1990 (Same As) 2013-05-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB983 (Same As) 2013-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3580)
HB2125 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1315 (Related) 2013-07-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 137.
HR322 (Related) 2013-08-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB983 (Same As) 2013-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3580)
HB2125 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1315 (Related) 2013-07-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 137.
HR322 (Related) 2013-08-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Department of the Treasury
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation