US HB1907 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nurse Staffing Standards for Patient Safety and Quality Care Act of 2013 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require hospitals to implement a staffing plan that includes a minimum direct care registered nurse-to-patient ratio by unit, adjustments above the minimum ratio under appropriate circumstances, and compliance with minimum licensed practical nurse staffing requirements. Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to develop a national acuity tool to establish nurse staffing requirements above minimum ratios. Directs the Secretary to adjust Medicare payments to hospitals to cover additional costs incurred in providing services to Medicare beneficiaries that are attributable to compliance with such ratios. Authorizes a nurse to object to, or refuse to participate in, any activity, policy, practice, assignment or task if in good faith it would violate minimum ratios under this Act or if the nurse is not prepared by education, training, or experience to fulfill the assignment without compromising the safety of any patient or jeopardizing the license of the nurse. Prohibits a hospital from: (1) taking specified actions against a nurse based on the nurse's refusal to accept an assignment for such a reason; or (2) discriminating against any patient, employee, or any other individual for good faith complaints or grievances relating to the care, services, or conditions of the hospital or of any affiliated or related facilities. Prohibits actions by hospitals to restrain such rights. Sets forth enforcement provisions. Applies provisions of this Act through federal health programs, including Medicare, Medicaid, and Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) health benefits programs. Includes stipends in the nurse workforce loan repayment and scholarship program. Expands the nurse retention grant program to authorize programs to implement nurse preceptorship and mentorship projects.
Title
Nurse Staffing Standards for Patient Safety and Quality Care Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] |
Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] |
Rep. William Enyart [D-IL] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Hahn [D-CA] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. George Miller [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. John Tierney [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB739 (Related) 2013-04-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Department of Health and Human Services
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Hospital care
Medicaid
Medical education
Medicare
Military medicine
Nursing
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' medical care
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Department of Health and Human Services
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Hospital care
Medicaid
Medical education
Medicare
Military medicine
Nursing
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1907/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1907/BILLS-113hr1907ih.pdf |