US HB1897 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Vietnam Human Rights Act of 2013 - Prohibits U.S. nonhumanitarian assistance to the government of Vietnam in excess of FY2012 amounts unless the President certifies to Congress that the government of Vietnam has made substantial progress respecting political, media, and religious freedoms, minority rights, access to U.S. refugee programs, return of confiscated religious estates and property, and actions to end trafficking in persons and the release of political prisoners. Authorizes the President to waive such requirements if increased U.S. nonhumanitarian assistance would promote the purposes of this Act or is otherwise in the U.S. national interest. Allows the President to waive such authority with respect to: (1) all U.S. nonhumanitarian assistance to Vietnam; or (2) one or more programs, projects, or activities of such assistance. Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the United States should take measures to overcome the jamming of Radio Free Asia by Vietnam and that the Broadcasting Board of Governors should not cut staffing, funding, or broadcast hours for the Vietnamese language services of the Voice of America and Radio Free Asia; (2) U.S.-Vietnam educational and cultural exchange programs should promote freedom and democracy in Vietnam; (3) the Secretary of State should oppose Vietnam's candidacy for membership on the United Nations Human Rights Council (UNHRC); (4) Vietnam should be designated as a country of particular concern for religious freedom; and (5) Vietnam does not fully comply with the minimum standards for the elimination of trafficking and is not making significant efforts to bring itself into compliance. Directs the President to report annually to Congress regarding Vietnam's compliance with the provisions of this Act.
Title
Vietnam Human Rights Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Rep. James Moran [D-VA] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Loretta Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Stockman [R-TX] |
Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-01 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 405 N: 3 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2013-08-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-08-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 3 (Roll no. 435). (text: CR 7/31/2013 H5249-5251) |
2013-08-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5295-5296) |
2013-07-31 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-07-31 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1897. |
2013-07-31 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5249-5254) |
2013-07-31 | House | Mr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-06-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-06-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E815-816) |
2013-05-15 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Unanimous Consent . |
2013-05-15 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations. |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1649 (Related) 2013-11-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Area studies and international education
Asia
Congressional oversight
Cultural exchanges and relations
Detention of persons
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Human rights
Human trafficking
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
News media and reporting
Political movements and philosophies
Property rights
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Rule of law and government transparency
United Nations
Vietnam
Asia
Congressional oversight
Cultural exchanges and relations
Detention of persons
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Human rights
Human trafficking
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
News media and reporting
Political movements and philosophies
Property rights
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Rule of law and government transparency
United Nations
Vietnam