US HB1865 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 588.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 588.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 35 Park Street in Danville, Vermont, as the "Thaddeus Stevens Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 35 Park Street in Danville, Vermont, as the "Thaddeus Stevens Post Office".
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 588. |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report. |
2014-11-12 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-06-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-06-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5376) |
2014-06-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1865. |
2014-06-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5376) |
2014-06-17 | House | Mr. Meadows moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-05-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-05-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
SB885 (Same As) 2014-11-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-189.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Postal service
Vermont
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Postal service
Vermont