US HB1829 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nutria Eradication and Control Act of 2011 - Amends the Nutria Eradication and Control Act of 2003 to revise the nutria eradication program by authorizing the Secretary of the Interior to provide financial assistance to Delaware, Louisiana, Maryland, North Carolina, Oregon, Virginia, and Washington (currently only to Maryland and Louisiana). Establishes the goals of such Program as: (1) eradicating nutria in Maryland; (2) eradicating or controlling nutria in Louisiana, Delaware, North Carolina, Oregon, Virginia, and Washington; and (3) restoring wetlands damaged by nutria. Requires that the Maryland program consist of management, research, and public education activities carried out in accordance with the United States Fish and Wildlife Service's document entitled "Eradication Strategies for Nutria in the Chesapeake and Delaware Bay Watersheds" dated March 2002 and updated in March 2009. Authorizes appropriations for FY2012-FY2016. Requires the Secretary and the National Invasive Species Council to develop long-term nutria control or eradication programs to: (1) significantly reduce and restore nutria damaged wetlands in Delaware, Oregon, North Carolina, Virginia, and Washington; and (2) promote voluntary, public-private partnerships to eradicate or control nutria and restore nutria-damaged wetlands in such states.
Title
Nutria Eradication and Control Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Rodney Alexander [R-LA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2011-05-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB899 (Same As) 2011-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 231.
SB3525 (Related) 2012-11-26 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 504.
SB3525 (Related) 2012-11-26 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 504.
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Delaware
Ecology
Environmental protection
Louisiana
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Maryland
North Carolina
Oregon
Public-private cooperation
Virginia
Washington State
Wetlands
Delaware
Ecology
Environmental protection
Louisiana
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Maryland
North Carolina
Oregon
Public-private cooperation
Virginia
Washington State
Wetlands
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1829/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1829/BILLS-112hr1829ih.pdf |