US HB1744 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Multispecies Habitat Conservation Plan Implementation Act - Amends P.L. 99-548, commonly known as the Mesquite Lands Act of 1986, to require proceeds from sales in the fourth area to be used for the implementation of a multispecies habitat conservation plan for the Virgin River in Clark County, Nevada, including any associated groundwater monitoring plan. Amends the Lincoln County Land Act of 2000 to require implementation of a multispecies habitat conservation plan in Lincoln County, Nevada. Extends, until November 29, 2021, withdrawal and purchase authority with respect to the fifth and sixth areas.
Title
Multispecies Habitat Conservation Plan Implementation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Joseph Heck [R-NV] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2276 (Related) 2013-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
SB757 (Same As) 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 122.
SB757 (Same As) 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 122.
Subjects
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Nevada
Public lands and natural resources
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Nevada
Public lands and natural resources
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1744/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1744/BILLS-113hr1744ih.pdf |