US HB1652 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 190-2-1-1)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Student Non-Discrimination Act of 2013 - Prohibits public school students from being excluded from participating in, or subject to discrimination under, any federally-assisted educational program on the basis of their actual or perceived sexual orientation or gender identity or that of their associates. Considers harassment to be a form of discrimination. Prohibits retaliation against anyone for opposing conduct they reasonably believe to be unlawful under this Act. Authorizes federal departments and agencies to enforce these prohibitions by cutting off the educational assistance of recipients found to be violating them. Allows an aggrieved individual to assert a violation of this Act in a judicial proceeding and recover reasonable attorney's fees should they prevail. Deems a state's receipt of federal educational assistance for a program to constitute a waiver of sovereign immunity for conduct prohibited under this Act regarding such program.
Title
Student Non-Discrimination Act of 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2013-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1088 (Related) 2013-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1094 (Related) 2013-10-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 218.
SB1094 (Related) 2013-10-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 218.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil actions and liability
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Government liability
Legal fees and court costs
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Civil actions and liability
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Government liability
Legal fees and court costs
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1652/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1652/BILLS-113hr1652ih.pdf |