US HB1648 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Workforce Protections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Workforce Protections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting America's Workers Act - Amends the Occupational Safety and Health Act of 1970 (OSHA) to expand its coverage to federal, state, and local government employees. Authorizes the Secretary of Labor, under specified conditions, to cede OSHA jurisdiction to another federal agency with respect to certain occupational standards or regulations for such agency's employees. Declares OSHA inapplicable to working conditions covered by the Federal Mine Safety and Health Act of 1977. Increases protections for whistle blowers under OSHA. Prescribes requirements relating to: (1) a employer's duty to furnish a place of employment free from recognized hazards causing or likely to cause death or serious physical harm that the employer creates or controls or in which the employer exposes any individual (not just an employer's employee) performing work there; (2) the posting of employee rights; (3) a site-controlling employer's duty to keep a site log for recordable injuries and illnesses of all employees, including employees of the site-controlling employer or others (including independent contractors) performing work there; (4) employer reporting of employee work-related deaths or hospitalizations, (5) a prohibition against employers adopting or implementing policies or practices that discourage or discriminate against employee reporting of work-related injuries or illnesses; (6) a prohibition against the loss of wages or employee benefits due to an employee participating in a workplace inspection; (7) investigations of incidents resulting in death or the hospitalization of two or more employees which occur in a place of employment; and (8) a prohibition against the issuing, modifying, or settling of unclassified citations for occupational health and safety standard violations. Continues requirements relating to: (1) the rights of an employee (including a former employee or family member in lieu of an employee) who has sustained a work-related injury or illness that is the subject of an inspection or investigation; (2) an employer's right to contest citations and penalties; and (3) periods permitted for an employer to correct serious, willful, or repeated violations pending an employer's contest to a citation and procedures for stays of the time period for abatement of those violations. Increases civil and criminal penalties for certain OSHA violators. States that pre-final order interest on any penalties owed shall begin to accrue on the date a party contests a citation, at an interest rate calculated at the current underpayment rate. Prescribes requirements for the Secretary's evaluation of state occupational safety and health plans as well as workplace health hazard evaluations by the National Institute for Occupational Safety and Health (NIOSH). Revises requirements for state plans for the development and enforcement of state occupational safety and health standards in lieu of applicable federal occupational safety and health standards. Requires the Secretary to approve plans that provide for state consideration of repeated occupational safety and health violations committed by an employer within the state as well as those committed under other occupational safety and health plans in states where the Secretary has jurisdiction. Requires a state that has an approved plan for the development and enforcement of occupational safety and health standards to amend its plan to conform to the requirements of this Act within 12 months after enactment of this Act.
Title
Protecting America's Workers Act
Sponsors
Rep. George Miller [D-CA] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] |
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Henry Waxman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections. |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB665 (Related) 2013-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB805 (Related) 2013-04-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB805 (Related) 2013-04-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Labor
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
Judicial review and appeals
Labor and employment
Legal fees and court costs
Occupational Safety and Health Review Commission
State and local government operations
Worker safety and health
Administrative remedies
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Labor
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
Judicial review and appeals
Labor and employment
Legal fees and court costs
Occupational Safety and Health Review Commission
State and local government operations
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1648/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1648/BILLS-113hr1648ih.pdf |