US HB1612 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-23 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-23 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to convey to Tuskegee University (Alabama) specified real property at 2400 Hospital Road in Tuskegee, for the purpose of permitting the University to use the property to further the educational and general welfare of its students.
Title
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to convey a parcel of land in Tuskegee, Alabama, to Tuskegee University, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] | Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL] | Rep. Jo Bonner [R-AL] |
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2013-07-23 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-09 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Alabama
Armed forces and national security
Educational facilities and institutions
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Higher education
Land transfers
Armed forces and national security
Educational facilities and institutions
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Higher education
Land transfers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1612/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1612/BILLS-113hr1612ih.pdf |