US HB1587 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Energy Infrastructure Improvement Act - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior (or the Secretary of Agriculture, as appropriate for administrative jurisdiction over the federal lands involved) to issue permits for rights-of-way, temporary easements, or other necessary authorizations to allow a permittee to construct, operate, maintain, expand, or modify a natural gas, oil, or petroleum products pipeline and related facilities on eligible federal lands. Directs the Secretary to: (1) charge fees for such permits, (2) determine the initial fixed term for a permit, and (3) renew any right-of-way issued under this Act if the pipeline and its related facility is in commercial operation and operated and maintained in accordance with this Act. Grants the Secretary enforcement and modification powers, including fines and suspension or termination of rights-of-way.
Title
Energy Infrastructure Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] |
Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry. |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Energy
General public lands matters
Judicial review and appeals
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Oil and gas
Pipelines
User charges and fees
General public lands matters
Judicial review and appeals
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Oil and gas
Pipelines
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1587/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1587/BILLS-113hr1587ih.pdf |