US HB1422 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
EPA Science Advisory Board Reform Act of 2013 - Amends the Environmental Research, Development, and Demonstration Authorization Act of 1978 to revise the process of selecting members of the Science Advisory Board, guidelines for participation in Board advisory activities, and terms of office. (The Board provides scientific advice to the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency [EPA].) Prohibits federally registered lobbyists from being appointed to the Board. Revises the procedures for providing advice and comments to the Administrator by: (1) including risk or hazard assessments in the regulatory proposals and documents made available to the Board, and (2) requiring advice and comments to be included in the record regarding any such proposal and published in the Federal Register. Revises the operation of Board member committees and investigative panels to: (1) require that they operate in accordance with the membership, participation, and policy requirements (including new requirements for public participation in advisory activities of the Board) contained in this Act; (2) deny them authority to make decisions on behalf of the Board; and (3) prohibit direct reporting to EPA. Adds guidelines for the conduct of Board advisory activities, including concerning: (1) avoidance of making policy determinations or recommendations, (2) communication of uncertainties, (3) dissenting members' views, and (4) periodic reviews to ensure that such activities address the most important scientific issues affecting EPA. Prohibits this Act from being construed as supplanting the requirements of the Federal Advisory Committee Act or the Ethics in Government Act of 1978.
Title
EPA Science Advisory Board Reform Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Michele Bachmann [R-MN] | Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] |
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Ralph Hall [R-TX] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] |
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Tom Price [R-GA] |
Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Steve Stockman [R-TX] |
Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Roll Calls
2014-11-18 - House - On Passage (Y: 229 N: 191 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 195 N: 225 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-11-18 - House - On Agreeing to the Amendment (Y: 232 N: 184 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 195 N: 225 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-11-18 - House - On Agreeing to the Amendment (Y: 232 N: 184 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2014-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-11-18 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 229 - 191 (Roll no. 525). |
2014-11-18 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 195 - 225 (Roll no. 524). |
2014-11-18 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H8062) |
2014-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Sean Maloney motion to recommit with instructions, pending reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to prohibit people from serving on the Science Advisory Board if they represent a corporation or a trade association with a financial interest in the outcome of the Boards decisions. The reservation of the point of order was subsequently withdrawn. |
2014-11-18 | House | Mr. Maloney, Sean moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. (consideration: CR H8062-8063; text: H8062) |
2014-11-18 | House | H.AMDT.1145 On agreeing to the Stewart amendment (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 232 - 184 (Roll no. 523). |
2014-11-18 | House | H.AMDT.1145 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) without objection. (consideration: CR H8061) |
2014-11-18 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 756, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Stewart Part A amendment No. 1. |
2014-11-18 | House | H.AMDT.1145 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Stewart. (consideration: CR H8060-8062; text: CR H8060)Amendment makes sundry technical and conforming changes to the bill in order to allow the measure to be properly applied to existing statute. |
2014-11-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8060-8064) |
2014-11-18 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair announced that pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, further proceedings on H.R. 1422 had been postponed. |
2014-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1422. |
2014-11-18 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1422, H.R. 4012 and H.R. 4795. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1422, H.R. 4012, and H.R. 4795. General debate is limited to 1 hour for each bill. The resolution specifies certain amendments are in order for H.R. 1422, H.R. 4012, and H.R. 4795. One motion to recommit with instructions is permitted for each bill. |
2014-11-18 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 756. (consideration: CR H8050-8064; text of measure as reported in the House: CR H8050-8051) |
2014-11-17 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 756 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1422, H.R. 4012 and H.R. 4795. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1422, H.R. 4012, and H.R. 4795. General debate is limited to 1 hour for each bill. The resolution specifies certain amendments are in order for H.R. 1422, H.R. 4012, and H.R. 4795. One motion to recommit with instructions is permitted for each bill. |
2013-07-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 119. |
2013-07-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 113-165. |
2013-04-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 16. |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1853 (Related) 2013-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HR756 (Related) 2014-11-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR756 (Related) 2014-11-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Research administration and funding
Advisory bodies
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Research administration and funding